Global Patent Index - EP 1091818 A1

EP 1091818 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A CASTING MOULD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING A CASTING MOULD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM PRÄPARIEREN EINER GIESSFORM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PREPARER UN MOULE DE COULEE

Publication

EP 1091818 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99922255 A

Priority

  • FR 9901307 W
  • FR 9808088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780322A1] Preparing a casting mold consists of: (a) providing in the first half (1a) of the mold (1) a recess forming a pouring cup (2) emerging at the level of the joint plane (4), in a housing (5) having in its upper part an upper opening (6); (b) providing in the second half (1b) of the mold (1) a second recess (8) having at the level of the joint plane (4) an opening (9) with smaller dimensions than the corresponding dimensions of the housing (5); and (c) assembling the two half molds (1a, 1b) along the joint plane (4) and inserting in the housing (5), essentially vertically through the top opening (6), a filter (12) for filtering the molten metal. An Independent claim is also included for a casting mold prepared as above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967045A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780322 A1 19991231; FR 2780322 B3 20000512; AU 3937099 A 20000110; DE 69906294 D1 20030430; EP 1091818 A1 20010418; EP 1091818 B1 20030326; TR 200003822 T2 20010621; US 6540005 B1 20030401; WO 9967045 A1 19991229; ZA 200007785 B 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAUSSAN ET CIE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906294 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL

2003-03-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAUSSAN, JEAN

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAUSSAN, GERARD

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAUSSAN, ANDRE

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL