Global Patent Index - EP 1091825 A1

EP 1091825 A1 2001-04-18 - APPARATUS FOR FRICTION STIR WELDING

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR FRICTION STIR WELDING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM REIBSCHWEISSEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE PAR FRICTION A MOUVEMENT CYCLIQUE

Publication

EP 1091825 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964644 A

Priority

  • SE 9802390 W
  • SE 9704800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934951A1] The invention concerns an apparatus for friction stir welding, comprising a welding unit (6) including a welding head (13), a worktable (4) including a backing unit (8) to support the workpieces (2, 3) to be welded together along their joint line, and clamping means (21, 22) to clamp the workpieces to the worktable in a direction towards one another during the welding operation. The backing unit consists of at least two backing parts (8a, 8b, 8c; 28a, 28b) or of at least one backing part (8a, 8b, 8c; 28a, 28b) and one additional welding head (30; 32), said backing parts being freely exchangeable, one for the other, before each welding operation as is also each backing part for an additional welding head, and vice versa.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 37/04; B23K 20/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 20/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 20/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934951A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934951 A1 19990715; AU 1992199 A 19990726; DE 69838760 D1 20080103; DE 69838760 T2 20081030; EP 1091825 A1 20010418; EP 1091825 B1 20071121; NO 20003062 A 20000817; NO 20003062 D0 20000615; NO 330040 B1 20110207; SE 9704800 D0 19971219; US 6419142 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101218

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2008-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69838760 P 20080103

2007-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2007-11-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021217

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE