Global Patent Index - EP 1091831 A1

EP 1091831 A1 2001-04-18 - IMPROVED POLISHING PAD WITH REDUCED MOISTURE ABSORPTION

Title (en)

IMPROVED POLISHING PAD WITH REDUCED MOISTURE ABSORPTION

Title (de)

VERBESSERTES POLIERKISSEN MIT REDUZIERTER FEUCHTIGKEITSABSORPTION

Title (fr)

TAMPON A POLIR AMELIORE AVEC UNE MOINDRE ABSORPTION D'HUMIDITE

Publication

EP 1091831 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99955238 A

Priority

  • GB 9901515 W
  • US 8774298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962673A1] A polishing pad or belt or other device with increased resistance to moisture absorption for improved planarizing effectiveness and consistency. The relatively moisture resistant polishing pad contains additives to improve wetting of the pad surface for good slurry distribution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 3/26; B24B 37/04; B24D 3/34; B24D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/24 (2012.01); B24D 3/26 (2006.01); B24D 3/34 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/24 (2013.01); B24D 3/26 (2013.01); B24D 3/34 (2013.01); B24D 11/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962673A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962673 A1 19991209; AU 4272499 A 19991220; EP 1091831 A1 20010418; JP 2002516764 A 20020611; TW 449528 B 20010811

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020725

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PERIPHERAL PRODUCTS INC

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MADISON FILTER 2 LIMITED

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MADISON FILTER GROUP INC.

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MADISON CMP 3 INC.

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT