Global Patent Index - EP 1091835 A1

EP 1091835 A1 2001-04-18 - MOTOR SAW

Title (en)

MOTOR SAW

Title (de)

MOTORSÄGE

Title (fr)

SCIE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1091835 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932734 A

Priority

  • DE 19828727 A
  • EP 9904434 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828727A1] The chain saw (100) has an engine (101) fastened to a housing (102). The carburetor (16) is elastically mounted on the housing for damping resp. reduction of vibrations, via a single-point suspension. The housing carries esp. an elastic sleeve (21) of rubber, and the carburetor is removeably locked into the sleeve via a spherical locking part (25). The intake channel (11) is connected to the carburetor via an elastic intake hose (15), which passes through a vertical dividing wall (23) in the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/02 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000330A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910005 U1 19991111; DE 19828727 A1 19991230; EP 1091835 A1 20010418; EP 1091835 B1 20031105; US 6334421 B1 20020101; WO 0000330 A1 20000106; WO 0000330 A9 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907640 P 20031211

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000710

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE