Global Patent Index - EP 1091844 A1

EP 1091844 A1 2001-04-18 - PRESS, ESPECIALLY A CONTINUOUS PRESS

Title (en)

PRESS, ESPECIALLY A CONTINUOUS PRESS

Title (de)

PRESSE, INSBESONDERE KONTINUIERLICHE PRESSE

Title (fr)

PRESSE, NOTAMMENT PRESSE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1091844 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932727 A

Priority

  • DE 19828822 A
  • EP 9904403 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828822C1] The wood chip panel press has a cylinder (8), mounted in a press cylinder block (11), for each tandem arranged press cylinder assembly (8,9). The feed pipe (12) for hydraulic fluid to the press cylinders is integral with the cylinder block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/34; B30B 5/06; F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/24 (2006.01); B30B 1/34 (2006.01); B30B 5/06 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/036 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1404 (2013.01); B27N 3/24 (2013.01); B30B 1/34 (2013.01); B30B 5/06 (2013.01); B30B 15/007 (2013.01); F15B 11/036 (2013.01); F15B 15/1428 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000346A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828822 C1 19990930; AU 4900999 A 20000117; CN 1094826 C 20021127; CN 1307520 A 20010808; EP 1091844 A1 20010418; EP 1091844 B1 20021218; WO 0000346 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903845

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-11-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021218

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903845 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903845 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001202

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE