Global Patent Index - EP 1091873 A1

EP 1091873 A1 2001-04-18 - DEVICE FOR CENTERING PHARMACEUTICAL CONTAINERS, IN PARTICULAR, FOR HEAD SECTIONS OF AMPOULES IN A FILLING UNIT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CENTERING PHARMACEUTICAL CONTAINERS, IN PARTICULAR, FOR HEAD SECTIONS OF AMPOULES IN A FILLING UNIT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZENTRIEREN VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN BEHÄLTNISSEN, INSBESONDERE DER KOPFABSCHNITTE VON AMPULLEN IM BEREICH EINER ABFÜLLEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SERVANT A CENTRER DES RECIPIENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES, EN PARTICULIER LA PARTIE TETE D'AMPOULES DANS UN MECANISME DE REMPLISSAGE

Publication

EP 1091873 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00941878 A

Priority

  • DE 0001224 W
  • DE 19919029 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19919029A1] The invention relates to a device (10) for centering pharmaceutical containers, in particular, for centering head sections (1) of ampoules (2) in a filling unit. Said device has two centering elements (25, 35) with first and second receiving elements (27, 37). The centering elements (25, 35) can be driven in a transverse direction to the direction of transport (23) of the ampoules (2) and cooperate with a fixed counter support (16). As a result of the configuration of the centering elements (25, 35) and the counter support (16), the head sections (1) of the ampoules (2) are pushed by the first centering element (25) into the receiving elements (37) of the second centering element (35) in a tight-fitting manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/06 (2006.01); B65B 3/00 (2006.01); B67C 3/00 (2006.01); B67C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0064743A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19919029 A1 20001109; CN 1170733 C 20041013; CN 1302269 A 20010704; EP 1091873 A1 20010418; EP 1091873 B1 20040630; JP 2002542126 A 20021210; JP 4511742 B2 20100728; WO 0064743 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006942 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI