Global Patent Index - EP 1091875 A1

EP 1091875 A1 2001-04-18 - TAMPER RESISTANT CLOSURE

Title (en)

TAMPER RESISTANT CLOSURE

Title (de)

ORIGINALITÄTSVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

FERMETURE INVIOLABLE

Publication

EP 1091875 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99955251 A

Priority

  • US 9912110 W
  • US 8751798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962768A1] A method and apparatus for forming a tamper resistant seal on a plastic bag containing a loaf of bread or other products is disclosed. The neck (125) of the bag (125b) is flattened, gripped between a pair of upper inboard and outboard gathering belts and a pair of lower inboard and outboard gathering belts adjacent opposite sides of a segment of the neck of the bag. A row of perforations(132) is formed in the bag neck as the bag moves adjacent a roller provided with teeth or cutting elements. Heated air jets are directed to engage the segment of the bag bridging between the inboard and the outboard gathering belts for fusing panels of the bag together to form a sealed strip spaced from the row of perforations in the bag neck to facilitate removal of the sealed strip from the bag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/02 (2006.01); B65B 51/00 (2006.01); B65B 51/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962768 A1 19991209; AU 4324899 A 19991220; AU 763499 B2 20030724; BR 9910788 A 20020205; CA 2333754 A1 19991209; CA 2333754 C 20071120; DE 69926893 D1 20050929; DE 69926893 T2 20060614; DK 1091875 T3 20051219; EP 1091875 A1 20010418; EP 1091875 A4 20030806; EP 1091875 B1 20050824; ES 2249036 T3 20060316; HK 1036439 A1 20060113; JP 2002516789 A 20020611; JP 4568428 B2 20101027; MX PA00011890 A 20050715

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249036 T3

2006-01-13 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036439

2005-12-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-11-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926893 P 20050929

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-08-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 51/00 A

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 61/18 B

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE