Global Patent Index - EP 1091877 A1

EP 1091877 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING TUBULAR LABELS TO OBJECTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING TUBULAR LABELS TO OBJECTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON ETIKETTENHÜLSEN AUF GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER DES ETIQUETTES-MANCHONS SUR DES OBJETS

Publication

EP 1091877 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00927104 A

Priority

  • DE 19919880 A
  • DE 19920905 A
  • DE 10002401 A
  • EP 0003872 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0066437A1] The invention relates to a method and device for applying a wrap-around label to objects such as bottles or the like in which a wrap-around label is grasped on the forward edge thereof by an spreading jaw unit and is pulled in an axial direction over the object. Before being covered, the object is held on an area of its outside surface in a positive and/or frictionally engaged manner. When the covering process is initiated, the holding device located on the outside surface is temporarily removed as soon as the spreading jaw unit at least partially surrounds the outside surface of the object and, at the latest, before reaching the desired height at which the wrap-around label adheres to the object. The object is grasped once again on an area of the outer surface now covered by the label, and the label is fixed such that it does not slip while the spreading jaw unit is removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/00 (2006.01); B65C 3/06 (2006.01); B65C 3/16 (2006.01); B65G 47/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/065 (2013.01); Y10T 156/103 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1033 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1768 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1771 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0066437A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0066437 A1 20001109; AT 296230 T 20050615; BR 0006089 A 20010320; CN 1241789 C 20060215; CN 1297410 A 20010530; EP 1091877 A1 20010418; EP 1091877 B1 20050525; ES 2241601 T3 20051101; US 2006213607 A1 20060928; US 7060143 B1 20060613

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050525

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KRONES A.G.

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241601 T3

2005-10-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-08-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050725

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010383 P 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-05-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EDER, ERICH

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EIBAN, GUENTHER

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENGLBRECHT, HERMANN

2004-12-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING TUBULAR LABELS TO OBJECTS

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI