Global Patent Index - EP 1091900 A1

EP 1091900 A1 2001-04-18 - YARN BRAKE, PARTICULARLY FOR YARN FEEDERS OF LOOMS

Title (en)

YARN BRAKE, PARTICULARLY FOR YARN FEEDERS OF LOOMS

Title (de)

GARNBREMSE, INSBESONDERE FÜR FADENLIEFERVORRICHTUNGEN IN WEBMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

FREIN DE FIL, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES FOURNISSEURS DE FILS DANS DES METIERS

Publication

EP 1091900 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99929171 A

Priority

  • EP 9904004 W
  • IT MI981313 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964337A1] Yarn brake (B) for a feeder storing drum (D) having a rounded withdrawal rim (5), said yarn brake comprising a frustoconical braking body (1) of radially deformable material as a carrier for an inner circumferentially continuous brake surface (2), said braking body (1) being supported in a stationary holding device and comprises a spring assembly (S) consisting at least of circumferentially spaced discrete spring tongues (T) engaging said holding device (H) for centering and axially biasing said brake surface (2) in relation to said holding device (H) wherein the braking body (1) is supported by a group of concentrically arranged bending springs (C), each of which is bent outwardly from the generatrice (G) of the frustocone part of the braking body (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22; D03D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/366 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964337A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964337 A1 19991216; AU 4607399 A 19991230; CN 1137845 C 20040211; CN 1308587 A 20010815; DE 69903733 D1 20021205; EP 1091900 A1 20010418; EP 1091900 B1 20021030; IT MI981313 A1 19991210

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130610

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120605

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903733 20021205

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2002-10-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL