Global patent index - EP 1091903 A1

EP 1091903 A1 2001-04-18 - HAND RAIL GUIDE FOR AN ESCALATOR OR MOVING PAVEMENT

Title (en)

HAND RAIL GUIDE FOR AN ESCALATOR OR MOVING PAVEMENT

Title (de)

HANDLAUFFÜHRUNG EINER ROLLTREPPE ODER EINES ROLLSTEIGES

Title (fr)

GUIDAGE DE MAIN COURANTE D'UN ESCALIER ROULANT OU D'UN TROTTOIR ROULANT

Publication

EP 1091903 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927992 A

Priority

  • DE 19829326 A
  • EP 9904148 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001606A1] The invention relates to a device for guiding a hand rail, especially in the deflection area of an escalator or moving pavement, comprising a balustrade made notably of a transparent material. The area of the balustrade facing the hand rail is provided with a shaped hand rail guide which especially in the deflection area cooperates with at least one flexible element housing antifriction bearings. The projection surface of the internal diameter of the bearings covers the balustrade surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001606A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001606 A1 20000113; CN 1128094 C 20031119; CN 1314868 A 20010926; DE 19861072 A1 20000210; DE 19861072 C2 20010719; EP 1091903 A1 20010418; EP 1091903 B1 20030416; HK 1038548 A1 20040402

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130616

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905088

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130616

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905088

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001028

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB