Global Patent Index - EP 1091977 A2

EP 1091977 A2 2001-04-18 - A METHOD OF IDENTIFYING HORMONE RECEPTOR LIGANDS

Title (en)

A METHOD OF IDENTIFYING HORMONE RECEPTOR LIGANDS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUM BESTIMMEN VON HORMONREZEPTOR-LIGANDEN

Title (fr)

METHODE D'IDENTIFICATION DE LIGANDS DE RECEPTEURS D'HORMONES

Publication

EP 1091977 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99937191 A

Priority

  • US 9914801 W
  • US 10829898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001717A2] The present invention relates to methods of identifying compounds which are modulators of nuclear receptors, including retinoid, steroid, glucocorticoid, thyroid, vitamin D and peroxisome proliferator receptors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/00 (2013.01); G01N 33/50 (2013.01); G01N 33/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001717A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001717 A2 20000113; WO 0001717 A3 20000420; EP 1091977 A2 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040708

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLERGAN, INC.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAGPAL, SUNIL

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHANDRARATNA, ROSHANTHA, A.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GHOSN, CORINE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT