Global Patent Index - EP 1091985 A1

EP 1091985 A1 2001-04-18 - POLYACRYLATES WITH IMPROVED BIODEGRADIBILITY

Title (en)

POLYACRYLATES WITH IMPROVED BIODEGRADIBILITY

Title (de)

POLYACRYLATE MIT VERBESSERTER BIODEGRADABILITÄT

Title (fr)

POLYACRYLATES A BIODEGRADABILITE AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 1091985 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99922242 A

Priority

  • FR 9901279 W
  • FR 9806939 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779435A1] The invention concerns novel biodegradable polymers based on carboxylic polyacid containing fragile and degradable sites. Said polymers are linear or branched. They can be used in various applications, in particular in detergent compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 220/04; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/04 (2006.01); C08L 101/16 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/04 (2013.01); C11D 3/3757 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962971A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779435 A1 19991210; FR 2779435 B1 20050311; AU 3936599 A 19991220; CA 2334091 A1 19991209; CN 1158316 C 20040721; CN 1311802 A 20010905; EP 1091985 A1 20010418; JP 2002517529 A 20020618; JP 3659888 B2 20050615; US 6900171 B1 20050531; WO 9962971 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKEMA FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKEMA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040114

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE