Global Patent Index - EP 1091988 A1

EP 1091988 A1 2001-04-18 - SHOCK VINYLAROMATIC POLYMER BY POLYMERISATION OF A VINYLAROMATIC MONOMER IN THE PRESENCE OF A STABLE FREE RADICAL AND A POLYMERISATION INITIATOR

Title (en)

SHOCK VINYLAROMATIC POLYMER BY POLYMERISATION OF A VINYLAROMATIC MONOMER IN THE PRESENCE OF A STABLE FREE RADICAL AND A POLYMERISATION INITIATOR

Title (de)

VINYLAROMATISCHE POLYMERE MIT SCHLAGZÄHIGKEIT, DIE HERGESTELLT SIND BEI EINER POLYMERISATION AUF BASIS VON VINYLAROMATISCHEN MONOMEREN IN GEGENWART VON STABILISIERTEN FREIRADIKALEN UND POLYMERISATIONSINITIATOR

Title (fr)

POLYMERE VINYLAROMATIQUE CHOC PAR POLYMERISATION D'UN MONOMERE VINYLAROMATIQUE EN PRESENCE D'UN RADICAL LIBRE STABLE ET D'UN AMORCEUR DE POLYMERISATION

Publication

EP 1091988 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920946 A

Priority

  • FR 9901272 W
  • FR 9806940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779437A1] The invention concerns a method for preparing a composition comprising a vinylaromatic polymer enclosing rubber nodules. The invention is characterised in that it includes a step for polymerising at least one vinylaromatic monomer in the presence of rubber, a polymerisation initiator and a stable free radical, said step being such that [FSFR x (SFR)] : [FAMO x (AMO)] ranges from 0.05 to 1, FFSR and FAMO representing the functionality of the stable free radical and the initiator respectively and (SFR) and (AMO) representing the molar quantities of the stable free radical and the initiator respectively. The final composition is particularly resistant to shocks and/or shiny.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 279/02; C08F 291/02; C08L 51/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 279/02 (2006.01); C08F 291/02 (2006.01); C08L 51/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 279/02 (2013.01); C08L 51/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962975A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779437 A1 19991210; FR 2779437 B1 20041015; AU 3833299 A 19991220; CA 2334096 A1 19991209; CA 2334096 C 20070403; CN 1207317 C 20050622; CN 1311804 A 20010905; EP 1091988 A1 20010418; HU 0102303 A2 20011028; HU 0102303 A3 20020628; HU 227587 B1 20110829; JP 2002517532 A 20020618; JP 4497392 B2 20100707; MX PA00011888 A 20020424; PL 344449 A1 20011105; TW I237644 B 20050811; US 6815500 B1 20041109; WO 9962975 A1 19991209; WO 9962975 A8 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2005-05-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS FRANCE

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKEMA

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE