Global Patent Index - EP 1092043 A1

EP 1092043 A1 2001-04-18 - ALGORITHMIC TESTING IN LABORATORY MEDICINE

Title (en)

ALGORITHMIC TESTING IN LABORATORY MEDICINE

Title (de)

ALGORITHMISCHE PRÜFUNG IN DER LABORMEDIZIN

Title (fr)

ESSAI PAR ALGORITHMES EN MEDECINE DE LABORATOIRE

Publication

EP 1092043 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922762 A

Priority

US 9909503 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0066776A1] A method of pipelining a disease specific diagnostic algorithm on an n-bit data word stored in a memory whereby the n-bit data word is divided into clinical tests describing ranges of normal values. Then, each of the clinical tests of the n-bit data word is read out from memory. Upon receiving a first of the results of the clinical tests, the result is compared with the normal value and the detection algorithm is computed based on the first result. This results in continuation with the next test if positive or terminate if negative. The above-steps are repeated recursively until all of the required test in the diagnostic algorithm are computed to provide the complete diagnosis of a disease.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0066776 A1 20001109; AU 3968799 A 20001117; CA 2335590 A1 20001109; EP 1092043 A1 20010418; EP 1092043 A4 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1038043

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2008-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071101

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050421

2004-12-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20041111

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE