Global Patent Index - EP 1092053 A1

EP 1092053 A1 2001-04-18 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING THREADS FROM A LAYER

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING THREADS FROM A LAYER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABTEILEN VON FÄDEN AUS EINER SCHICHT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR SEPARER DES FILS D'UNE COUCHE

Publication

EP 1092053 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923363 A

Priority

  • CH 9900252 W
  • CH 137798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000687A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for separating adjacent threads which are stretched in a first and a second location and substantially form together a surface. In order to provide a method and a device serving to reliably separate threads from a yarn layer even when the threads consist of so-called untwisted multifilaments, several threads are grasped with separating means (5, 15, 25, 35) at least in one location, whereupon the grasped threads are subjected to different relative accelerations substantially in their transversal direction. After one or several separation processes, the first thread can be easily grasped, e.g. by a drawing-in hook and then removed from the layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/14; D03J 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 9/02 (2006.01); D03J 1/13 (2006.01); D03J 1/14 (2006.01); D03J 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/18 (2013.01); D03J 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000687A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000687 A1 20000106; AT 233336 T 20030315; AU 4028599 A 20000117; CA 2336098 A1 20000106; CN 1094532 C 20021120; CN 1307655 A 20010808; DE 59904381 D1 20030403; EP 1092053 A1 20010418; EP 1092053 B1 20030226; EP 1092053 B8 20030625; JP 2002519531 A 20020702; TR 200003798 T2 20010723

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100610

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STAUBLI A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: STAEUBLI AG PFAEFFIKON

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-06-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STAEUBLI AG PFAEFFIKON

2003-05-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904381 P 20030403

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT