Global patent index - EP 1092054 A2

EP 1092054 A2 2001-04-18 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A NON-WOVEN FIBRE FABRIC

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A NON-WOVEN FIBRE FABRIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VLIESES AUS FASERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN NON-TISSE A PARTIR DE FIBRES

Publication

EP 1092054 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99939910 A

Priority

  • DE 9901793 W
  • DE 19827567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827567A1] To produce a nonwoven material (44) from fibers, with perforated hole structures (36) over the whole cross section of the material (44), a perforation mechanism (22,26) has facing surfaces (24,28) for the fiber web (18) to move between them. The surface (24) of one unit (22) has a number of spikes (30) pointing at the fiber web. The surface (28) of the facing unit (26) has openings (32), where the spikes (30) can pass through and displace the fibers without damage to form the opening structures (36) in the nonwoven. The fiber web (18) is converted into a nonwoven (44) at the station (38) where it is bonded with heat directly after the perforation structure (36) has been formed. The openings (32) in the lower surface (28) are linked to an underpressure and overpressure system (34), such as with a fan, so that fibers (14) from the web (18) which lie in the shaped openings (32) are cleared by blowing or suction. The lower unit (26) is a perforated belt or a calender roller. The upper unit is a roller (22) with a dia. of 100-500 mm, or it is a plate with an up and down movement. The spikes (30) at the roller (22) are cone-shaped, or as involutes, each with a rounded tapering point. The spikes (30) have a length of 2-5 mm. The fibers (14) are pref. staple fibers, or continuous filaments, bicomponent fibers and filaments. An Independent claim is included for a perforated nonwoven material (44) where the perforated hole structures (36) have a dia. of 0.5-5.0 mm. Preferred Features: The bonding point surfaces cover 10-40% of the fabric surface, in a distribution of 60-110 bonding points/cm<2>. The perforation holes (36) are out-of-round. The hole structures (36) in the nonwoven (44) are at irregular gaps from each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 13/00; D04H 1/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01); Y10T 442/602 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967454A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827567 A1 19991223; AU 5406599 A 20000110; EP 1092054 A2 20010418; EP 1092054 B1 20021113; US 6750166 B1 20040615; WO 9967454 A2 19991229; WO 9967454 A3 20000309

INPADOC legal status

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903412

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011214

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE