Global Patent Index - EP 1092063 A1

EP 1092063 A1 2001-04-18 - FILM TRANSFER COATING

Title (en)

FILM TRANSFER COATING

Title (de)

FILMTRANSFERBESCHICHTUNG

Title (fr)

COUCHAGE PAR TRANSFERT DE FILM

Publication

EP 1092063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931320 A

Priority

  • FI 9900548 W
  • FI 981446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967468A1] The invention concerns a method in film transfer coating in a film press, in which press the nip (N) of the film press is formed out of two faces placed against each other and moving in the same direction so that said moving faces are pressed against each other in the nip. A coating agent or surface size is applied as a film (F1, F2) onto at least one of the moving faces that form the film press nip (N) and that are subjected to pressing, in which connection the coating agent or surface size is transferred in the nip (N) between the moving faces onto the paper or board web (W) running through the nip. After the nip the web is separated either directly from the nip or so that it follows one or the other of the moving faces. The web is separated from the nip so that, at least at one side of the web, the curve radius of the opening geometry is larger than 0.75 metre. The invention also concerns a film press intended for carrying out the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 1/14 (2006.01); D21H 23/56 (2006.01); B05C 9/04 (2006.01); D21H 23/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/0826 (2013.01); B05C 1/14 (2013.01); D21H 23/56 (2013.01); B05C 9/04 (2013.01); D21H 23/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967468A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967468 A1 19991229; AT 246286 T 20030815; AU 4787199 A 20000110; DE 69910034 D1 20030904; DE 69910034 T2 20040226; EP 1092063 A1 20010418; EP 1092063 B1 20030730; FI 104435 B 20000131; FI 981446 A0 19980623; FI 981446 A 19991224

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130622

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69910034

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 246286 T

- Effective date: 20130622

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-06-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040622

2003-10-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910034 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB SE

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020115

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB SE