Global Patent Index - EP 1092072 A1

EP 1092072 A1 2001-04-18 - TOP GUIDE WITH SPRING LOADED WHEEL

Title (en)

TOP GUIDE WITH SPRING LOADED WHEEL

Title (de)

OBERE FÜHRUNG MIT FEDERBELASTETEM RAD

Title (fr)

GUIDE SUPERIEUR A ROUE A RESSORT

Publication

EP 1092072 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920361 A

Priority

  • GB 9812059 A
  • US 9909839 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2338018A] A wheeled top-guide for rolling movement of a door along a track having a first roller on a first axle 50 in rolling engagement with one wall of a track; and a vertically oriented torsion member 58 connected via a horizontal arm 60 to a second axle 62 and second roller. When the guide is inserted into a track (see fig 6) a torque is induced in the torsion rod, said torque maintaining said rollers in firm rolling contact with the side walls of said track. In a preferred embodiment the same principle is applied to three rollers (see figs 8-10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 13/00; A47H 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0691 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2338018 A 19991208; GB 2338018 B 20020904; GB 9812059 D0 19980805; CA 2273463 A1 19991204; CA 2273463 C 20020813; EP 1092072 A1 20010418; EP 1092072 A4 20060405; PL 189545 B1 20050831; PL 344474 A1 20011105; RU 2180035 C1 20020227; WO 9963190 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080605

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOME DECOR HOLDING COMPANY

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070524

2006-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060221

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE