Global Patent Index - EP 1092073 A1

EP 1092073 A1 2001-04-18 - SUSPENSION DEVICE

Title (en)

SUSPENSION DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION

Publication

EP 1092073 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907403 A

Priority

  • CH 0000146 W
  • CH 77399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0065186A1] The suspension device which serves to connect a door element (2) to a running mechanism (6) guided in a rail (4) has a securing means (30) which can be connected to the door element (2), and a connecting screw (10) which is provided with a screw head (11) and a shank (12-15), can be fitted into the securing means (30) and screwed into a threaded drill-hole (9) provided in the running mechanism (6). The securing means (30) has two wing elements (32a, 32b) which can be connected to the door element (2) and which are connected by a central piece (33) which is provided with a recess (34) and is bent upward relative to the wing elements (32a, 32b) in such a manner that, after the securing means (30) is installed, the screw head (11) can be guided through under the central piece (33), so that the shank (12-15) can be introduced into the recess (34), which is adjoined by a collar (35) serving to hold the screw head (11). The suspension device, which can be produced cost-effectively and fitted and adjusted with little outlay, only requires a little space, so that the door element (2) can be fitted at a small distance from the running mechanism (6) and rail (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/64 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/702 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); Y10T 16/353 (2013.01); Y10T 16/364 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0065186A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0065186 A1 20001102; AR 023526 A1 20020904; AT 323817 T 20060515; AU 2901300 A 20001110; AU 765786 B2 20031002; BR 0006084 A 20010320; BR 0006084 B1 20081118; CA 2335456 A1 20001102; CA 2335456 C 20080115; CN 1208537 C 20050629; CN 1302350 A 20010704; CZ 20004724 A3 20010711; CZ 299560 B6 20080903; DE 50012595 D1 20060524; EE 04824 B1 20070416; EE 200000624 A 20020215; EP 1092073 A1 20010418; EP 1092073 B1 20060419; ES 2261182 T3 20061116; HK 1035758 A1 20060217; HU 0102502 A2 20011028; HU 0102502 A3 20020228; HU 222963 B1 20040128; ID 27136 A 20010301; IL 137707 A 20031031; IL 137707 D0 20011031; JO 2210 B 20041007; JP 2002543310 A 20021217; JP 4943587 B2 20120530; MY 117216 A 20040531; NO 20005999 A 20001127; NO 20005999 D0 20001127; NO 321518 B1 20060515; RU 2234582 C2 20040820; SK 19522000 A3 20011203; SK 286762 B6 20090507; TR 200003790 T1 20010621; TW 534935 B 20030601; US 6418588 B1 20020716; ZA 200001665 B 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130314

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120315

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060419

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060720

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2261182 T3

2006-11-15 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-09-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060919

2006-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PETER RUTZ

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012595 P 20060524

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-04-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060419

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2001-08-22 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-08-16 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI