Global patent index - EP 1092075 A1

EP 1092075 A1 2001-04-18 - VEHICLE DOOR WINDOW-LIFT WITH AUTOMATIC FIXING TO THE WINDOW SLIDER SUPPORTING THE WINDOW

Title (en)

VEHICLE DOOR WINDOW-LIFT WITH AUTOMATIC FIXING TO THE WINDOW SLIDER SUPPORTING THE WINDOW

Title (de)

FENSTERHEBER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR MIT AUTOMATISCHER BEFESTIGUNG DES SCHEIBENMITNEHMERS AN DER SCHEIBE

Title (fr)

LEVE-VITRE DE PORTE DE VEHICULE A FIXATION AUTOMATIQUE A LA VITRE DU CURSEUR SUPPORT DE VITRE

Publication

EP 1092075 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99926578 A

Priority

  • FR 9901578 W
  • FR 9808422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780746A1] The invention concerns a vehicle door window-lift, comprising a guide rail (1) for a slider (6) supporting the window (7) capable of being driven by a cable (10) and means for automatically fixing the slider on the window; said means comprise a dowel pin (16) adapted to slide transversely in a bore (14) in the slider and in a hole (15) in the window, and means (17, 18) for causing the dowel pin to slide automatically from a first delivery position wherein it is not inserted in the hole, up to an operative position wherein it penetrates in the window hole and locks the slider on the window. Said means comprise two ramps (17, 18) inclined relative to the dowel pin (16) and to its sliding direction (F), formed on the rail (1) such that when the slider (6) moves along the rail (1), driven by the drive cable traction, it causes the dowel pin (16) to be thrust by the ramp from its delivery position towards its operative position wherein it penetrates into the window hole (15) and locks the slider (6) on the window. Said arrangement avoids providing locking by deformation of a plastic part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); B60J 1/17 (2006.01); E05F 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05F 11/382 (2013.01); E05F 2011/387 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/64 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/52 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/56 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/742 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001910A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780746 A1 20000107; FR 2780746 B1 20001006; AU 4377199 A 20000124; DE 69903304 D1 20021107; DE 69903304 T2 20040513; EP 1092075 A1 20010418; EP 1092075 B1 20021002; ES 2182534 T3 20030301; JP 2002519553 A 20020702; US 6418668 B1 20020716; WO 0001910 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060701

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-07-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021002

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182534

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903304

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT