Global Patent Index - EP 1092076 A1

EP 1092076 A1 2001-04-18 - WINDOW LIFT DRIVE OR SLIDING ROOF DRIVE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

WINDOW LIFT DRIVE OR SLIDING ROOF DRIVE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

FENSTERHEBER- BZW. SCHIEBEDACHANTRIEB FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT DE LEVE-VITRE OU DE TOIT OUVRANT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1092076 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99941405 A

Priority

  • DE 9901887 W
  • DE 19829209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829209A1] According to the invention, a variable transmission is provided in the sense of an essentially constant load of the drive motor over the entire regulating distance, especially an increased transmission when arriving in the closed position, in order to increase the work load of the actuating drive motor (1) while providing an improved jamming prevention of a closing part. Said closing part is, in particular, a motor vehicle window pane (2) which can be displaced by a transmission, especially a cable drive drum (3 or 4). For this, the drive motor, for example, is not to be designed with regard to the maximal load when arriving in the closed position and, at the same time, a rapid jamming prevention is possible due to the slower speed when approaching the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16; E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E05D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/486 (2013.01); E05F 11/483 (2013.01); E05F 15/697 (2013.01); E05D 13/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/618 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/654 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/664 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001911A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829209 A1 20000113; DE 19829209 C2 20010503; EP 1092076 A1 20010418; EP 1092076 B1 20040922; ES 2228088 T3 20050401; US 2001023556 A1 20010927; WO 0001911 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELL, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120125

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2228088

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: WINDOW LIFT DRIVE OR SLIDING ROOF DRIVE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT