Global Patent Index - EP 1092077 A1

EP 1092077 A1 2001-04-18 - MILLING SYSTEM FOR FORMING A WINDOW IN THE WALL OF A TUBULAR

Title (en)

MILLING SYSTEM FOR FORMING A WINDOW IN THE WALL OF A TUBULAR

Title (de)

FRÄSSYSTEM ZUM ERSTELLEN EINES FENSTERS IN EINEM ROHR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FRAISAGE PERMETTANT DE FORMER UNE FENETRE DANS LA PAROI D'UN TUBULAIRE

Publication

EP 1092077 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931252 A

Priority

  • EP 99931252 A
  • EP 9904700 W
  • EP 98305275 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001921A1] A system is provided for milling a window in a casing of a borehole formed in an earth formation. The system comprises a milling tool for milling said window, a guiding device for guiding the milling tool along a selected path within the casing during milling said window, the guiding device having means for fixedly arranging the guiding device within the casing. The guiding device is provided with thrust means for thrusting the milling tool along the selected path during milling the window.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 29/06; E21B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/06 (2006.01); E21B 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 29/06 (2013.01); E21B 7/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001921 A1 20000113; AR 019187 A1 20011226; AU 4781799 A 20000124; AU 751528 B2 20020822; CA 2336326 A1 20000113; CA 2336326 C 20070828; DE 69933564 D1 20061123; DE 69933564 T2 20070621; EP 1092077 A1 20010418; EP 1092077 B1 20061011; GC 0000060 A 20040630; NO 20006696 A 20010228; NO 20006696 D0 20001229; NO 317380 B1 20041018

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933564 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001230

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL