Global Patent Index - EP 1092081 A1

EP 1092081 A1 2001-04-18 - ROTOR FOR A TURBOMACHINE

Title (en)

ROTOR FOR A TURBOMACHINE

Title (de)

ROTOR FÜR EINE TURBOMASCHINE

Title (fr)

ROTOR POUR TURBOMACHINE

Publication

EP 1092081 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939943 A

Priority

  • DE 9901840 W
  • DE 19828817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828817A1] A first flange (9,10) to one side of the disk (4) is bolted (14) to a second flange (17) on an adjoining disk (5,6), the first flange being axially spaced (A) inwards relative the disk (4) side (7,8). This first flange comes in ring form having peripheral slots which are equi-spaced and open inwards, and the ring (9,10) is holed between the slots. The second flange (17) on disk (5,6) is itself holed (24) in line with the slots in the first flange and a flange sector (20) of an intermediate stage seal is clamped in between first and second flanges and similarly holed to line up with the specified first flange slots, using these interposed holes to locate the connecting bolts (14). The bolts terminate at right angles adjoining the disk (4), thus giving a transverse sector (13), with the bolts in Tee-form. The axial spacing (A) should exceed the thickness of the transverse sector (13). Flange (17) has an axial thrust sector (18) for the bolt sectors (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000719A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828817 A1 19991230; DE 19828817 C2 20000713; CA 2335964 A1 20000106; EP 1092081 A1 20010418; EP 1092081 B1 20030730; JP 2002519564 A 20020702; US 6499957 B1 20021231; WO 0000719 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-10-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906444 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE