Global Patent Index - EP 1092095 A1

EP 1092095 A1 2001-04-18 - HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE SCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1092095 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936360 A

Priority

  • DE 9901591 W
  • DE 19828963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828963A1] The hydraulic switch system to control at least one low-load and one high-load operating unit (4,6), with a setting pump (2), has a bypass (32) which links the outlet from the measurement diaphragm through the pressure scales (16a) to at least one connection for the low-load operating unit (6). The measurement diaphragm (14a,14b) is formed by a proportional valve, so that the operating connections can be linked to the connections at the pump or tank. The bypass (32) is controlled according to the position of the valve slide at the proportional valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/16; F15B 11/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/05 (2006.01); F15B 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/003 (2013.01); F15B 11/05 (2013.01); F15B 11/16 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20553 (2013.01); F15B 2211/253 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3144 (2013.01); F15B 2211/329 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50545 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/71 (2013.01); F15B 2211/78 (2013.01); F15B 2211/88 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000747A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828963 A1 19991230; EP 1092095 A1 20010418; EP 1092095 B1 20030326; EP 1092095 B2 20070418; JP 2002519596 A 20020702; JP 4520041 B2 20100804; US 6367365 B1 20020409; WO 0000747 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-08-08 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-04-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-02-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE