Global Patent Index - EP 1092111 A1

EP 1092111 A1 2001-04-18 - PROJECTING HEADLIGHT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

PROJECTING HEADLIGHT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

PROJEKTIONSSCHEINWERFER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

PROJECTEUR POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1092111 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931053 A

Priority

  • DE 19829345 A
  • EP 9904019 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829345A1] The invention relates to a projecting headlight for motor vehicles, substantially comprising a headlight housing, a lamp, a parabolic mirror, a projection lens and a holding frame for the individual components. To be able externally to enlarge the optical design of the projection lens in a projecting headlight for motor vehicles without unnecessarily increasing the overall dimensions, the invention provides for the projection lens (1) on the side facing the mirror to have an internal area (3) which is illuminated as prescribed and surrounded by an annular single-piece shaped part (2) which is embodied such that the holding frame (4) of the projection lens (1) is essentially positioned rearwards of the illuminated internal body of the projection lens.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21W 101/10 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1258 (2013.01); F21S 48/1216 (2013.01); F21S 48/1283 (2013.01); F21S 48/155 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001983A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829345 A1 20000113; DE 19829345 B4 20091126; EP 1092111 A1 20010418; EP 1092111 B1 20040908; JP 2002519839 A 20020702; WO 0001983 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-12-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041219

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910463 P 20041014

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020613

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB