Global Patent Index - EP 1092114 A1

EP 1092114 A1 2001-04-18 - WATER-COOLED GRATE FOR A COMBUSTION FURNACE

Title (en)

WATER-COOLED GRATE FOR A COMBUSTION FURNACE

Title (de)

WASSERGEKÜHLTER ROST FÜR BRENNANLAGE

Title (fr)

GRILLE A TUBES REFROIDIS PAR L'EAU DESTINE A UN FOUR A COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1092114 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919478 A

Priority

  • IB 9900936 W
  • SE 9801905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963270A1] A grate device (1) for a combustion furnace comprises a grate element (2) and a turnable shaft assembly (3) connected thereto. The grate element (2) has a first system of ducts (17.1) for circulating coolant through the grate element (2). The shaft assembly (3) has a second system of ducts (17.2), which communicates with the first system of ducts and forms a coolant inlet and outlet (14, 16). The grate element (2) comprises a girder means (6) which is non-rotatably connected with the shaft assembly (3) and which contains a part of the first system of ducts (17.1), which part communicates with the second system of ducts (17.2). The grate element (2) comprises a plate means (5) which is mounted on the girder means (6) and forms a grate area and through which the remaining part (7) of the first system of ducts extends for cooling the grate area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23H 7/16; F23H 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/10 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 7/10 (2013.01); F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963270 A1 19991209; AT 248323 T 20030915; AU 3725399 A 19991220; DE 69910783 D1 20031002; DE 69910783 T2 20040617; DE 69910783 T8 20041111; DK 1092114 T3 20031020; EP 1092114 A1 20010418; EP 1092114 B1 20030827; SE 512432 C2 20000313; SE 9801905 D0 19980529; SE 9801905 L 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160505

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040525

2003-12-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BABCOCK & WILCOX VOLUND APS

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910783 P 20031002

2003-09-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BABCOCK & WILCOX VOLUND APS

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE