Global Patent Index - EP 1092203 A1

EP 1092203 A1 2001-04-18 - TRAVEL PLANNING SYSTEM

Title (en)

TRAVEL PLANNING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM PLANEN VON REISEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PLANIFICATION D'ITINERAIRES

Publication

EP 1092203 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99932166 A

Priority

  • US 9914964 W
  • US 10932798 A
  • US 10932898 A
  • US 10948698 A
  • US 10962298 A
  • US 10987198 A
  • US 10987398 A
  • US 10987698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0002153A1] An airline travel planning system is described. The system includes a server computer executing a server process including a search process to search for set of pricing solutions in accordance with at least one destination and at least one origin. The search process represents the set of pricing solutions in the form of a directed acyclic graph. The system also includes a client computer executing a client process on the set of pricing solutions. The client process has a manipulation process that manipulates the set of pricing solutions in response to user preferences. Several processes are described including a process responsive to user preferences and to set of pricing solutions that provides pricing solutions sorted by said user preference, a process that sorts set of pricing solutions to produce a subset of said set of pricing solutions in accordance with user specified preferences, and a process that prunes from the directed acyclic graph nodes that are no longer contained within the subset of set of pricing solutions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/02 (2013.01); G06Q 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002153A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0002153 A1 20000113; AU 4852999 A 20000124; AU 4853099 A 20000124; EP 1092203 A1 20010418; EP 1145170 A2 20011017; EP 1145170 A3 20020911; WO 0002152 A2 20000113; WO 0002152 A3 20011011

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-04 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0050000000

- Effective date: 20140724

2014-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOOGLE INC.

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060410

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEMARCKEN, CARL, G.

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WERTHEIMER, JEREMY

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE