Global Patent Index - EP 1092224 A1

EP 1092224 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKING FLAT CABLE BUNDLES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKING FLAT CABLE BUNDLES

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG VON FLACHKABELBÜNDELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE FAISCEAUX DE CABLES PLATS

Publication

EP 1092224 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99931188 A

Priority

  • EP 9904435 W
  • FR 9808336 A
  • FR 9812332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000990A1] The invention concerns a method for making electrically conductive flat cable bundles, said cables being formed by flat strips made of conductive material separated from one another and enclosed between two layers made of non-conductive material. Said method is characterised in that it comprises the following steps: cutting up a conductive material into a plurality of strips; distributing the cut out strips between two sheets made of non-conductive material; assembling the non-conductive sheets and the conductive strips to produce a flat cable layer (10). The invention also concerns a corresponding device and a method and a device for making cable bundles using such flat cable layers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 13/00; H01R 43/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2006.01); H01B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/00 (2013.01); H01R 43/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000990A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000990 A1 20000106; DE 69941842 D1 20100204; EP 1092224 A1 20010418; EP 1092224 B1 20091223; ES 2338500 T3 20100507; JP 2002519831 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100924

2010-02-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69941842 P 20100204

2009-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-12-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: S-Y SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES FRANCE SAS

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE EEDS SYSTEMS

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT