Global Patent Index - EP 1092232 A1

EP 1092232 A1 2001-04-18 - DIELECTRICALLY IMPEDED DISCHARGE LAMP WITH A SPACER

Title (en)

DIELECTRICALLY IMPEDED DISCHARGE LAMP WITH A SPACER

Title (de)

DIELEKTRISCH BEHINDERTE ENTLADUNGSLAMPE MIT ABSTANDSHALTER

Title (fr)

LAMPE A DECHARGE DIELECTRIQUE INTERDITE, MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF ECARTEUR

Publication

EP 1092232 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00943530 A

Priority

  • DE 0001227 W
  • DE 19919363 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19919363A1] The invention relates to a discharge lamp suitable for operating with a dielectrically impeded discharge, comprising a discharge vessel with two vessel walls (2; 7) which are parallel relative to one another at least in certain sections, having at least one spacer (1) made of an optically transparent insulating material. The spacer or each of the spacers (1) contact both vessel walls (2; 7) by means of the bearing surfaces. The spacer or each of the spacers have an optically diffused surface (8) at least in the area of one of the bearing surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/30; H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/305 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0065635A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19919363 A1 20001109; CA 2336032 A1 20001102; CN 1253919 C 20060426; CN 1302450 A 20010704; EP 1092232 A1 20010418; HU 0102721 A2 20011228; HU 0102721 A3 20030828; JP 2002543562 A 20021217; TW 484166 B 20020421; US 6879108 B1 20050412; WO 0065635 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071101

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI