Global Patent Index - EP 1092253 A1

EP 1092253 A1 2001-04-18 - DOWNHOLE POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (en)

DOWNHOLE POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (de)

BOHRLOCH ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION D'ENERGIE POUR FOND-DE-TROU

Publication

EP 1092253 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902528 A

Priority

US 9800666 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01V 11/00 (2006.01); H02J 1/00 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

AU 5916498 A 19990802; EP 1092253 A1 20010418; EP 1092253 A4 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20041216

2003-07-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 02J 1/00 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01V 11/00 B

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-06 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: WELLDYNAMICS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WELLDYNAMIS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000414

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IE NL