Global patent index - EP 1092277 A1

EP 1092277 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING BETWEEN A FIRST COMMUNICATION UNIT AND A SECOND COMMUNICATION UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING BETWEEN A FIRST COMMUNICATION UNIT AND A SECOND COMMUNICATION UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM ERSTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSEINHEIT UND EINEM ZWEITEN KOMMUNIKATIONSEINHEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION ENTRE UNE PREMIERE UNITE DE TELECOMMUNICATION ET UNE SECONDE UNITE DE TELECOMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1092277 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911485 A

Priority

  • US 9906142 W
  • US 10652498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001083A1] The present invention provides a method for communicating between a first communication unit (111) and a second communication unit (112). The first communication unit (111) is in communication with an IP radio (141) that is connected to a base transceiver station controller (131). The BTS controller (131) is connected to a base station controller (121). The IP radio (141) is coupled to an external network (104) via an IP-enabled local area network (LAN) interface (171). The first communication unit (111) transmits a signal to the IP radio (141), which receives the signal. The signal is routed to the second communication unit (112) through the external network (104) via the IP-enabled local area network (LAN) interface (171).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/00; H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/4604 (2013.01); H04W 80/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001083 A1 20000106; EP 1092277 A1 20010418; EP 1092277 A4 20030924

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080110

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031128

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-09-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/00 A

2003-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 B

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT