Global Patent Index - EP 1092291 A1

EP 1092291 A1 2001-04-18 - TRANSMISSION OF DATA BY ULTRASOUND

Title (en)

TRANSMISSION OF DATA BY ULTRASOUND

Title (de)

ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN MITTELS ULTRASCHALL

Title (fr)

TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES PAR ULTRASONS

Publication

EP 1092291 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936393 A

Priority

  • DE 9901625 W
  • DE 19828972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001099A1] The invention relates to an ultrasonic transmission system. The signal used for transmission generates a broadband signal by means of a code spread and is able to eliminate echo by means of correlation. The transmission system has a transmitter (10) and a receiver (11). Digital information (1) is spread over a large bandwidth according to a CDMA technique, D/A converted (3) and then transmitted via an air interface (5) using ultrasound. The invention is preferably used for air interfaces which are a few metres in length. Possible applications include the connection of cordless handsets or handsfree telephones to telephones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 11/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 11/00 (2013.01); H04M 1/6066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001099A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001099 A1 20000106; CN 1148019 C 20040428; CN 1307764 A 20010808; EP 1092291 A1 20010418; EP 1092291 B1 20030326; US 2001005176 A1 20010628; US 6950681 B2 20050927

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140508 AND 20140514

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904748

- Effective date: 20120103

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO., L.P., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PALM, INC. (N.D.GES. D. STAATES DELAWARE), SUNNYVALE, US

- Document: DE 59904748

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-05-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110407 AND 20110413

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090820

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20090720

2009-09-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090813 AND 20090819

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-10-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904748 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB