Global Patent Index - EP 1092315 A1

EP 1092315 A1 2001-04-18 - DEDICATED SPEED-DIAL PRE-PAID TELEPHONE CALLING CARD

Title (en)

DEDICATED SPEED-DIAL PRE-PAID TELEPHONE CALLING CARD

Title (de)

SPEZIELLE GUTHABEN-TELEFONKARTE MIT KURZWAHL

Title (fr)

CARTE D'APPEL TELEPHONIQUE A PREPAIEMENT, A COMPOSITION ABREGEE, SPECIFIQUE

Publication

EP 1092315 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99957675 A

Priority

  • US 9912163 W
  • US 10794298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001137A1] System and a method for pre-programming a list of speed dial telephone numbers associated with a dedicated speed-dialing pre-paid telephone calling card. The system includes a data storage area (106) for storing a card identifier, a list of speed dialing numbers and a security code for limiting access to the speed dialing list. If the security code stored in the database (106) is the same as that input by the caller (120) the card processing systems (104) allow those numbers to be dialed, changed or added to.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/2745 (2006.01); H04M 3/44 (2006.01); H04M 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/745 (2013.01); H04M 3/44 (2013.01); H04M 17/00 (2013.01); H04M 2215/0108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001137 A1 20000106; CA 2336786 A1 20000106; EP 1092315 A1 20010418; EP 1092315 A4 20020717; JP 2002519948 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1035826

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-07-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04M 15/00 A, 7H 04M 3/44 B, 7H 04M 3/42 B

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRAVERMAN, DAVID

2001-06-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HERNANDEZ, DAVID, A.

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE