Global Patent Index - EP 1092334 A2

EP 1092334 A2 2001-04-18 - INTEGRATED ELEMENT MANAGER AND INTEGRATED MULTI-SERVICES ACCESS PLATFORM

Title (en)

INTEGRATED ELEMENT MANAGER AND INTEGRATED MULTI-SERVICES ACCESS PLATFORM

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG VON ELEMENTEN UND INTERGRIERTE ZUGRIFFSPLATTFORM FÜR MEHRERE DIENSTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ DE GESTION D'ÉLÉMENTS ET PLATE-FORME D'ACCÈS INTÉGRÉE POUR SERVICES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1092334 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99932142 A

Priority

  • US 9914913 W
  • US 9137198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001102A2] An integrated multi-services access platform includes a time division multiplex interface coupled to a time division multiplex network, a matrix in communications with the time division multiplex interface, a frame relay groomer coupled to the matrix, an asynchronous transfer mode matrix coupled to the frame relay groomer, and an asynchronous transfer mode interface coupled to a frame relay/asynchronous transfer mode network. The integrated multi-services access platform may further include an integrated element manager, which includes a centralized management system coupled to a time division multiplex operational support system, a frame relay/asynchronous transfer mode network management system interworking unit coupled to at least one frame relay/asynchronous transfer mode network management system, an element management function unit operable for service provisioning, fault management, element and network monitoring, and metric measurements, an element management database having service and network configurations, status, and billing information, a simple network management protocol unit, and at least one application program interface coupled to at least one telecommunications element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 11/04; H04L 12/24; H04Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 12/66 (2006.01); H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/0095 (2013.01); H04L 41/044 (2013.01); H04L 41/0213 (2013.01); H04L 41/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001102A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001102 A2 20000106; WO 0001102 A3 20000413; EP 1092334 A2 20010418; JP 2002519936 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20150923

2015-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUSTIN, DAVID E.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2015-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMAS, SHAJI A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2015-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2015-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GARCIA, CLEMENTE G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2015-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAZIER, PAUL R.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2015-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WALDING, ANDREW M.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2014-11-19 [D11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D11X

2013-10-02 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

- Effective date: 20130506

2013-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUSTIN, DAVID E.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2013-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2013-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAZIER, PAUL R.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2013-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMAS, SHAJI A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2013-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WALDING, ANDREW M.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2013-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GARCIA, CLEMENTE G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061127

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT