Global Patent Index - EP 1092335 A1

EP 1092335 A1 2001-04-18 - HEARING AIDS WITH SHIELDING FROM ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

HEARING AIDS WITH SHIELDING FROM ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

HÖRHILFEN MIT EINER ABSCHIRMUNG GEGEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STRAHLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PROTHESES AUDITIVES COMPORTANT UN BLINDAGE CONTRE LE RAYONNEMENT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LES PRODUIRE

Publication

EP 1092335 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917871 A

Priority

  • DE 19813904 A
  • EP 9902064 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951057A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a hearing aid with shielding from electromagnetic radiation by applying a metal coating to parts of or all of the housing frame (8) and/or the insides of the housing side parts. Said metal coating is applied using a vapour phase plasma deposition technique with a thermal metal vapour source (25, 26). The invention also relates to the corresponding hearing aid with shielding from electromagnetic radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; C23C 14/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/608 (2013.01); H04R 25/658 (2013.01); H04R 2225/49 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951057A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951057 A1 19991007; AU 3600399 A 19991018; EP 1092335 A1 20010418; EP 1092335 B1 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-06-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903662 20030116

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-08-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEARING AIDS WITH SHIELDING FROM ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI