Global Patent Index - EP 1092357 A2

EP 1092357 A2 2001-04-18 - Reversible cap

Title (en)

Reversible cap

Title (de)

Wendekappe

Title (fr)

Casquette réversible

Publication

EP 1092357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124247 A

Priority

DE 29918211 U

Abstract (en)

The two visible sides (6,7) are equipped with different markings (4,5) and present different information to a spectator. Each side (6,7) has different colors.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Wendekappe (1) vorgeschlagen, die an ihren beiden Tragseiten (6 u.7) jeweils unterschiedliche Wort - bzw. Bildkennzeichnungen (4 u.5) trägt. Die Wendekappe (1) ist dazu bestimmt, sie mit der jeweils zur Schau gestellten Trageseite (6 o.7) an unterschiedliche Gegebenheiten anzupassen. Damit ist dann die Kappe informationstechnisch immer aktuell. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 1/04; A42B 1/06; A42B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 1/06 (2006.01); A42B 1/20 (2006.01); G09F 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 1/206 (2013.01); G09F 21/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918211 U1 20000330; EP 1092357 A2 20010418; EP 1092357 A3 20010829

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021130

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI