Global patent index - EP 1092362 A2

EP 1092362 A2 2001-04-18 - Advanced backpack system

Title (en)

Advanced backpack system

Title (de)

Verbessertes Rucksacksystem

Title (fr)

Système évolué de sac à dos

Publication

EP 1092362 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309079 A

Priority

  • US 15944299 P
  • US 16031399 P
  • US 16102699 P
  • US 16104299 P
  • US 62670500 A

Abstract (en)

An integrated backpack system including an integrated hydrating frame for storing a liquid and providing a substantially rigid support to the backpack. A harness releasably secures the frame to the backpack. A movable pouch connected to the backpack with a shockcord moves from a storage position to an accessible position. A slidable pouch slides along a second belt between a storage position and an accessible position as well. A weight supporting and ventilating system shifts the weight of the backpack and its contents to the user's waist and hips and provides an airway for ventilation between the backpack and the user's back.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2006.01); A45F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2013.01); A45F 3/12 (2013.01); A45F 2003/045 (2013.01); A45F 2003/125 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092362 A2 20010418; EP 1092362 A3 20030716; AU 6651600 A 20010426; AU 779973 B2 20050224; AU 8019600 A 20010423; BR 0004845 A 20010807; CA 2385160 A1 20010419; CA 2385160 C 20100323; JP 2001161440 A 20010619; WO 0126502 A1 20010419

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040117

2004-05-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 45F 3/04 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 45F 3/16 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI