Global Patent Index - EP 1092374 A2

EP 1092374 A2 2001-04-18 - Mailbox with mechanical indication means

Title (en)

Mailbox with mechanical indication means

Title (de)

Briefkasten mit mechanischer Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Boîte aux lettres avec dispositif avertisseur mécanique

Publication

EP 1092374 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203569 A

Priority

DK BA199900366 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a mailbox comprising sides spaced apart and at least two movable members for filling and emptying the box where said sides and said members define an enclosed space. The box also comprises one or more mechanical indication means including at least one sign visible from the outside. The said mechanical indication means further comprises at least two mechanical connections, where each of said movable members is connected to said at least one sign by means of one of said mechanical connections. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 29/122

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 29/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 29/1225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092374 A2 20010418; EP 1092374 A3 20010919; DK 9900366 U3 19991227

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI