Global Patent Index - EP 1092408 A3

EP 1092408 A3 2001-05-02 - Modular nursing system to reduce the cost of care of the elderly and others

Title (en)

Modular nursing system to reduce the cost of care of the elderly and others

Title (de)

Modulares Krankenpflegesystem zur Reduzierung der Kosten im Alten- und Pflegebereich

Title (fr)

Système modulaire de soin permettant une réduction des coûts dans le domaine des soins gériatriques et autres

Publication

EP 1092408 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00116341 A

Priority

DE 19935102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19935102A1] The patient-care system consists of different modules which ca be used partly as beds and as arm-chairs. Defective parts can be replaced and added and aids economically fitted on. A wheel-chair can be placed to the right or left of the bed. A groove is on the underneath side of transverse bars on the bed and into which an angle-piece fits which folds down on the side of the chair. Seats, backrests and foot-rests on the chair are replaced by a element of a two-part mattress frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/00 (2006.01); A61G 7/10 (2006.01); A61G 7/012 (2006.01); A61G 7/015 (2006.01); A61G 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1019 (2013.01); A61G 5/006 (2013.01); A61G 7/1046 (2013.01); A61G 7/1057 (2013.01); A61G 7/012 (2013.01); A61G 7/015 (2013.01); A61G 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19935102 A1 20010308; EP 1092408 A2 20010418; EP 1092408 A3 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI