Global Patent Index - EP 1092410 A2

EP 1092410 A2 2001-04-18 - A lifting and supporting aid

Title (en)

A lifting and supporting aid

Title (de)

Hebe- und Stützhilfsmittel

Title (fr)

Moyen d'assistance au levage et portage

Publication

EP 1092410 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308997 A

Priority

GB 9924405 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a belt (10) that, in use, is attachable around the midriff of a person's body and can be used as an aid to lift or support the person, the belt (10) including: fastening means (13) that releasably fasten the belt (10) around the person's midriff; handle means (11A, 11B) that when gripped by a third party can aid with the lifting and support of the person; means (14A, 14B, 14C, 14D; 14A', 14B', 14C', 14D') for receiving at least one first strap (30, 31) member such that the belt can be converted into a harness which is connectable to a first lifting or support apparatus (40) that can lift or support the person from above; and connecting means (15) that, in use, are connectable to a support member that can support a further portion of the person's body and/or to at least one second strap member which is attachable to a second lifting or support apparatus that can lift or support the person from the side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10; A62B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01); A62B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1023 (2013.01); A61G 7/1051 (2013.01); A61G 7/1061 (2013.01); A61G 7/1069 (2013.01); A61G 2200/34 (2013.01); A61G 2200/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092410 A2 20010418; EP 1092410 A3 20020828; GB 2355248 A 20010418; GB 9924405 D0 19991215

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI