Global patent index - EP 1092454 A1

EP 1092454 A1 2001-04-18 - Gliding board

Title (en)

Gliding board

Title (de)

Schneegleitbrett

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse

Publication

EP 1092454 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420205 A

Priority

FR 9913052 A

Abstract (en)

Sliding board (1) has a zone to receive the user's feet with a plate (25) moving towards the inferior assembly (10) under the pressure applied by weight of the user. Rigid arms (20-23) are linking the moving plate to the inferior face at the end parts of the board.

Abstract (fr)

Planche de glisse (1) présentant une zone patin (2), destinée à recevoir le ou les pieds de l'utilisateur, prolongée vers l'avant par une zone avant (4), et à l'arrière par une zone arrière (3), et dont la structure comporte : un ensemble inférieur (10) comprenant la semelle de glisse (11), les carres (12), et un éventuel renfort inférieur (13) ; un ensemble supérieur (6) comprenant la couche supérieure de protection (7) et un renfort supérieur (8) ; un noyau intermédiaire (15) intercalé entre les ensembles inférieur (10) et supérieur (6) ; caractérisée en ce qu'elle comporte une plaque (25) située au niveau de la zone patin, et apte à se déplacer en direction de l'ensemble inférieur (10) sous l'effet d'une pression exercée par le pied de l'utilisateur, et au moins un bras rigide longitudinal (20-23), logé à l'intérieur de la structure de la planche, traversant au moins en grande partie l'épaisseur du noyau (15), l'extrémité (40 - 43) du bras la plus éloignée de la zone patin prenant appui à la face inférieure du noyau (15), sur l'ensemble inférieur (10) de la planche, l'extrémité (30-33) du bras la plus proche de la zone patin prenant appui sous la plaque (25), à proximité des pieds de l'utilisateur, de manière à ce que les efforts exercés par l'utilisateur sur la surface supérieure (9) de la planche au niveau de la zone patin (2) de la planche soient directement transmis vers la surface inférieure de la planche par l'extrémité du bras (20-23) orientée en direction de l'ensemble inférieur (10) de la planche. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/04; A63C 5/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092454 A1 20010418; EP 1092454 B1 20061206; AT 347412 T 20061215; DE 60032202 D1 20070118; DE 60032202 T2 20070329; FR 2799659 A1 20010420; FR 2799659 B1 20020111; US 2004046362 A1 20040311; US 7021647 B2 20060404

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60032202

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2006-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKIS ROSSIGNOL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050215

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI