Global Patent Index - EP 1092503 A2

EP 1092503 A2 2001-04-18 - Grinding or cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Grinding or cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Schleif-oder Putzeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de meulage ou de polissage

Publication

EP 1092503 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810917 A

Priority

DE 19948996 A

Abstract (en)

Card wire is ground or cleaned by a grinding device incorporating an elastic layer (22), e.g. expanded foam, with a grinding medium (23), e.g. corundum particles, embedded throughout the material. The wire penetrates partly into the material. The device can be a complete or sectionalized roller and suction is provided to remove abraded material.

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung zum Schleifen von Garniturzähnen oder -drähten oder zum Putzen von Walzen, insbesondere in Karden, mit einem Schleifkörper (20) mit elastischer Oberfläche, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Schleifkörper (20) eine elastische Schicht (22) aufweist, in welcher Schleifmittel (23) eingelagert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/18; B24D 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2006.01); B24D 13/02 (2006.01); D01G 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2013.01); B24D 13/02 (2013.01); D01G 15/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19948996 A1 20010412; EP 1092503 A2 20010418; EP 1092503 A3 20030917; US 6508698 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061004

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI