Global Patent Index - EP 1092517 A2

EP 1092517 A2 2001-04-18 - Flexible rotary cutting die

Title (en)

Flexible rotary cutting die

Title (de)

Biegsames Rotationsstanzwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil d'estampage flexible

Publication

EP 1092517 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309044 A

Priority

US 15927099 P

Abstract (en)

A rotary cutting die includes a durable, flexible rotary die plate (14) having an inner surface and an outer surface (18). A cutting rule (12) that defines a cutting design is supported by the die plate. The cutting rule includes a cutting edge (16), which extends above the outer surface of the die plate, and a support edge (20) disposed within the die plate. The support edge includes a plurality of keyhole shaped notches (22). Preferably, a plurality of S-shaped hooks (24) are connected to the keyhole notches, and serve to reinforce the rotary die plate and to support the cutting rule in the rotary die plate. The rotary die plate (14) is preferably formed from a durable and flexible urethane-based material that exhibits a low shrink factor during curing or hardening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2013.01); B26F 1/384 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092517 A2 20010418; EP 1092517 A3 20021218; CA 2323381 A1 20010413

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060127

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI