Global Patent Index - EP 1092520 A1

EP 1092520 A1 2001-04-18 - Process for recycling of tyres, rubber or elastomeric scrap and thermoplastic scrap of any kind

Title (en)

Process for recycling of tyres, rubber or elastomeric scrap and thermoplastic scrap of any kind

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Wiederverwertung von Autopneus, Gummi oder Elastomerabfällen und Thermoplastabfällen jeder Art

Title (fr)

Procédé de recyclage des pneus, des caoutchoucs ou des déchets elatomériques et des déchets thermoplastiques de tout type

Publication

EP 1092520 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810939 A

Priority

EP 99810939 A

Abstract (en)

In a recycling process, rubber or elastomer materials and thermoplastic scraps of all types are shredded, mixed and either poured or pressed into molds in a hot or cold state. The thermoplastic flows between and/or encloses the rubber particles to form a solid product. Additional binders may be added.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zur Wiederverwertung von Gebrauchtreifen oder anderen Gummi- oder Elastomerabfällen in Verbindung mit Thermoplastabfällen aller Art, heiss oder kalt (unter hohem Druck gepresst) in Formen gegossen oder gepresst für alle möglichen Anwendungen. Eventuell auch mit zusätlichen Bindemittel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29B 17/00 (2006.01); B29C 39/00 (2006.01); B29C 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29B 17/0026 (2013.01); B29C 39/00 (2013.01); B29C 43/00 (2013.01); B29K 2021/00 (2013.01); B29K 2101/12 (2013.01); B29L 2030/00 (2013.01); Y02W 30/62 (2015.05); Y02W 30/68 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092520 A1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-03-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI