Global Patent Index - EP 1092537 A2

EP 1092537 A2 2001-04-18 - Arrangement for turning sheets in a sheet-fed rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Arrangement for turning sheets in a sheet-fed rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Einrichtungen zum Wenden von Bogen in einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Arrangement pour tourner des feuilles dans une machine d'impression rotative à feuilles

Publication

EP 1092537 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119487 A

Priority

DE 19949412 A

Abstract (en)

A storage drum (3) takes at least two sheets each held by at least one holder. A turning drum (23) positioned after the storage drum has at least one holder for the back edge of the sheet being turned. A vacuum is formed in the area between the sheet to be turned , the storage drum and the turning drum. The outer casing of the turning drum has at least one duct and or at least one through-hole connected with the interior of the turning drum. Air is sucked or blown into the vacuum part (35) via the through-hole.

Abstract (de)

Es werden Einrichtungen zum Wenden von Bogen in einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine vorgeschlagen, mit einer Speichertrommel für mindestens zwei Bogen, die jeweils mittels mindestens einer Halteeinrichtung gehalten sind, und mit einer der Speichertrommel nachgeordneten, mindestens eine Halteeinrichtung für die Hinterkante des zu wendenden Bogens aufweisende Wendetrommel, wobei durch das Ablösen des zu wendenden Bogens von der Speichertrommel und dessen Mitnahme durch die Wendetrommel in dem Bereich zwischen dem zu wendenden Bogen, der Speichertrommel und der Wendetrommel ein Unterdruck gebildet wird, der durch die Zufuhr von Umgebungsluft, Blasluft und/oder Druckluft ausgeglichen wird. Eine Ausführungsform der Wendeeinrichtung (1) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass im Mantel der Wendetrommel (23) mindestens ein Kanal (51) und/oder mindestens eine mit einem Innenraum (55) der Wendetrommel (23) verbundene Durchgangsöffnung vorgesehen sind/ist, über die Luft in den Unterdruckbereich (35) einsaugbar und/oder einblasbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10; B65H 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/05 (2006.01); B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092537 A2 20010418; EP 1092537 A3 20021016; EP 1092537 B1 20091202; AT 450376 T 20091215; CN 1222409 C 20051012; CN 1293109 A 20010502; DE 19949412 A1 20010419; DE 50015809 D1 20100114; HK 1036603 A1 20060526; JP 2001105570 A 20010417; JP 4603669 B2 20101222; US 2004094052 A1 20040520; US 6722276 B1 20040420; US 7207265 B2 20070424

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100918

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110918

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110918

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100918

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-04-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100903

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100313

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100402

2010-07-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-04-07 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-01-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015809 P 20100114

2010-01-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-12-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050721

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI