Global Patent Index - EP 1092539 A1

EP 1092539 A1 2001-04-18 - Arrangement for sealing an ink conveying reservoir in printing machines

Title (en)

Arrangement for sealing an ink conveying reservoir in printing machines

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Abdichtung eines farbführenden Reservoirs an Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rendre etanche un reservoir de transport d'encre dans des machines d'impression

Publication

EP 1092539 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121365 A

Priority

  • DE 19949346 A
  • FR 0007002 A

Abstract (en)

The printer-ink store is contained in a tank whose side defining surfaces (1) have contact surfaces which seal the ink-store against a rotary surface. An elastic element (6) in the side parts of an ink-feeder seals a gap. The side parts with their curved contact surface (19) are placed against the surface of a surface conveying the ink-store.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Einrichtung zur Aufnahme eines Farbvorrates (5) in einer Farbzuführeinrichtung (3, 4) im Farbwerk einer Druckmaschine. Am Farbwerk einer Druckmaschine ist ein Farbvorrat (5) in einem Reservoir aufgenommen, dessen seitliche Begrenzungsflächen (1, 2) Anlageflächen (16) aufweisen, die den Farbvorrat (5) gegen eine rotierende, den Farbvorrat (5) dosiert in das Farbwerk fördernde Oberfläche (14) abdichten. Ein einen Spalt (29, 36) abdichtende elastische Element (6, 11) sind in die Seitenteile (1, 2) einer Farbzuführeinrichtung (3, 4) eingelassen. Die Seitenteile (1, 2) sind über Anstellelemente (7, 8, 9; 13) mit einer Anstellkraft beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092539 A1 20010418; JP 2001105571 A 20010417; US 6571703 B1 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI