Global Patent Index - EP 1092542 A1

EP 1092542 A1 2001-04-18 - Ink jet printer and printing process

Title (en)

Ink jet printer and printing process

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker und Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Imprimante et procédé d'impression par jets d'encre

Publication

EP 1092542 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402817 A

Priority

FR 9912881 A

Abstract (en)

The output of the print control system (5) is coupled to a ink drop formation unit (4,4'), which breaks up the ink jet on receipt of a control signal. The ink jet is thus transformed into a succession of drops (13) and sections (10). A group (7) of deflection electrodes (26) direct the drop sections towards a ink recuperator (11). The printer (100) has a printing bus (2) emitting an ink jet (3) under pressure along the bus axis and contains: (a) an ink drop formation unit acting on the ink jet emitted from the bus by breaking up the jet at a predetermined axial distance; (b) an ink recuperation unit (11,12) for ink which is not received by a printing substrate (14); (c) a digital data memory storing data representing a print type; (d) a print controller, having input and output the input being connected to the memory so that it receives in a sequential fashion at least a part of the print data. Independent claims are also included for different arrangements of electrode groups

Abstract (fr)

Imprimante (100) à jet continu fonctionnant par brisure de jet (3) d'encre, pour former des gouttes (13) dirigées vers un substrat (14) d'impression en fonction de données numériques définissant un motif à imprimer, caractérisée en ce que les brisures des jets est commandée à la demande en fonction desdites données numériques, formant ainsi des gouttes (13) et des tronçons (10). Un groupe (7) d'électrodes (26) de déflexion fléchit les tronçons d'encre vers des moyens (11, 12) de récupération. Dans le mode préféré de réalisation, une zone (DB) de formation des gouttes est protégée du champ électrique de déflexion par un groupe (6) d'électrodes. Les électrodes de déflexion et de protection sont communes à l'ensemble des jets <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/035; B41J 2/015; B41J 2/085; B41J 2/105

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/015 (2006.01); B41J 2/02 (2006.01); B41J 2/08 (2006.01); B41J 2/105 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/105 (2013.01); B41J 2/02 (2013.01); B41J 2/08 (2013.01); B41J 2002/033 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0949077 A1 19991013 - TOXOT SCIENCE & APPL [FR]
  • [A] US 4638326 A 19870120 - YAMADA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al
  • [DA] US 4638328 A 19870120 - DRAKE DONALD J [US], et al
  • [DA] US 4230558 A 19801028 - FULWYLER MACK J
  • [A] DRAKE D J: "BINARY CONTINUOUS THERMAL INK JET BREAK OFF LENGTH MODULATION", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL,US,XEROX CORPORATION. STAMFORD, CONN, vol. 14, no. 3, 1 May 1989 (1989-05-01), pages 95 - 100, XP000027460
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 055 (M - 198) 5 March 1983 (1983-03-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092542 A1 20010418; EP 1092542 B1 20060104; CN 1170677 C 20041013; CN 1293111 A 20010502; DE 60025320 D1 20060330; DE 60025320 T2 20060831; ES 2254117 T3 20060616; FR 2799688 A1 20010420; FR 2799688 B1 20011130

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121013

2014-05-13 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140513

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121012

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60025320

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121012

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121012

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2254117

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60025320

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-03-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI