Global Patent Index - EP 1092554 A2

EP 1092554 A2 2001-04-18 - Thermal imaging process providing color versatility

Title (en)

Thermal imaging process providing color versatility

Title (de)

Thermisches Übertragungsverfahren mit hoher Farbfähigkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé d'imagerie thermique avec versatilité de couleurs

Publication

EP 1092554 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309066 A

Priority

US 15988099 P

Abstract (en)

A processes for laser thermal imaging and imaged laserable assemblages A method for forming an image comprising the steps of: (1) forming a first coating solution of a first colorant and a second coating solution of a second colorant; (2) providing a first base element having a first coatable surface; (3) forming a first imageable element by applying an amount of the first coating solution to the coatable surface to form a first thermally imageable layer thereon, the first thermally imageable layer having a first thermal sensitivity; (4) forming a first laserable assemblage including the first imageable element and a receiver element having an image receiving layer which is in contact with the first imageable element; (5) first imagewise exposing to laser radiation the first laserable assemblage, whereby the exposed areas of the first thermally imageable layer are transferred to the receiver element to form a first imaged receiver element; (6) providing a second base element having a second coatable surface; (7) forming a second imageable element by applying an amount of the second coating solution to the coatable surface to form a second thermally imageable layer thereon, the second thermally imageable layer having a second thermal sensitivity; (8) forming a second laserable assemblage including the second imageable element and the first imaged receiver element, the first image of which is adjacent to the second imageable element; (9) imagewise exposing to laser radiation, at substantially the same laser fluence as the first imagewise exposing, the second laserable assemblage, whereby the exposed areas of the second thermally imageable layer are transferred to the first imaged receiver element to form a second imaged receiver; and (10) separating at least the second imageable element from the second imaged receiver to produce an imaged receiver having a revealed image.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/34; B41M 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41M 5/26 (2006.01); B41M 5/34 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/41 (2006.01); B41M 5/46 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/345 (2013.01); B41M 5/465 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 7/0027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092554 A2 20010418; EP 1092554 A3 20030423; AU 6655000 A 20010426; JP 2001171159 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-07-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41M 5/34 A

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41M 5/38 B

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41M 7/00 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI