Global Patent Index - EP 1092555 A1

EP 1092555 A1 2001-04-18 - A method for making a lithographic printing plate involving on-press development

Title (en)

A method for making a lithographic printing plate involving on-press development

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischen Druckplatte mit auf der Druckpresse stattfindender Entwicklung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une plaque lithographique avec développement sur presse

Publication

EP 1092555 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203621 A

Priority

  • EP 00203621 A
  • EP 96202817 A
  • EP 95202873 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a method for making a lithographic printing plate comprising the steps of: (1) image-wise exposing to light an imaging element comprising (i) on a hydrophilic surface of a lithographic base an image forming layer comprising hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles with a glass transition temperature Tg of at least 80 DEG C dispersed in a hydrophilic binder and (ii) a compound capable of converting light to heat, said compound being comprised in said image forming layer or a layer adjacent thereto; (2) and developing a thus obtained image-wise exposed imaging element by supplying an aqueous liquid and/or ink to the image forming layer, wherein step (2) and preferably also step (1) are carried out while the imaging element is mounted on a print cylinder of a printing press.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41M 5/366 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0770497 A1 19970502; EP 0770497 B1 20020403; EP 1092555 A1 20010418; EP 1092555 B1 20020821

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141010

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141010

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69623140

2014-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140605 AND 20140611

2014-05-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS NV, BE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-02 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, US

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., PAKON INC., , US

- Document: DE 69623140

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., PAKON INC., , US

- Document: DE 69623140

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE; PAKON INC., MINNETONKA, MINN., US

- Document: DE 69623140

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE; PAKON INC., MINNETONKA, MINN., US

- Document: DE 69623140

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69623140

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20140314

2014-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69623140

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE

- Document: DE 69623140

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AGFA GRAPHICS N.V., MORTSEL, BE

- Document: DE 69623140

- Effective date: 20120403

2010-08-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100722 AND 20100728

2010-07-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-04-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100401 AND 20100407

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623140 20020926

2002-08-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 770497

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 770497

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB