Global Patent Index - EP 1092571 A3

EP 1092571 A3 2003-06-04 - Rail-road freight vehicles

Title (en)

Rail-road freight vehicles

Title (de)

Schienen-/Strassenlastfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Camions rail-route

Publication

EP 1092571 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00308798 A

Priority

GB 9924345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1092571A2] A rail-road freight vehicle which has a chassis (30) with fixed-position rail wheels, a tractor unit incorporating a road bogie unit at the front end, and a trailing road bogie unit (28), has locating/locking couplings between the chassis and each road bogie unit to improve directional and/or load stability. Female members (34) at each side of the chassis are arranged to receive locating/locking pins (36) at each side of each bogie unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60F 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60F 1/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092571 A2 20010418; EP 1092571 A3 20030604; GB 0024365 D0 20001122; GB 2356176 A 20010516; GB 2356176 B 20030219; GB 9924345 D0 19991215

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI